This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 04/07/2022 at 13:59:46 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Queen Esther Vick, deceased

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 In the Matter of the Estate of Queen Esther Vick, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Worthington, Susan C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-53

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Worthington, Susan C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vick, Donald Quentin Sr.

Decedent

Vick, Queen Esther

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Davis, Frank W.

115 N. Division

Guthrie, OK 73044

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

07/17/2018: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION "ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATINO OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE" (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER 1/19/19 & 1/26/19)

01/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION "ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATINO OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE" (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER 1/19/19 & 1/26/19)

GENERAL INVENTORY

01/17/2019: GENERAL INVENTORY

ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

01/17/2019: ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

07/17/2018: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

06/29/2018: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISERS

07/17/2018: APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISERS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

07/17/2018: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

06/29/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: Vick,DonaldQuentinSr.; Docket: Susan C. Worthington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION "ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATINO OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE" (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER 1/19/19 & 1/26/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GIA; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAPDH; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS-AT-LAW, AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION "NOTICE TO CREDITORS" (LOGAN COUNTY COURIER 7/19/18 & 7/26/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: Vick,QueenEsther; Docket: Susan C. Worthington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Vick, Queen Esther

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEST; Description: TESTIMONY OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS IN PROOF OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEST; Description: TESTIMONY OF EXECUTOR ON PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less