This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 12/13/2022 at 05:40:01 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF PEGGY ANN STEARMAN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF PEGGY ANN STEARMAN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEARMAN, PEGGY ANN

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF PEGGY ANN STEARMAN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MELTON, MARK

219 E Main Street

Davis, OK 73030

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND NOTICE FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

06/18/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE

06/18/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/31/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

11/30/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

10/27/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

10/27/2021: DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

10/27/2021: DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

10/27/2021: DISCLAIMER OF REAL PROPERTY

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

07/19/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION,

07/19/2021: ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION,

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

07/19/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/27/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER

10/28/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/27/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEVISEE AND LEGATEE, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less