This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 03/07/2022 at 02:16:48 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Norman Gomme, deceased.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 In the Matter of the Estate of Norman Gomme, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Bonner, Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-193

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Bonner, Stephen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gomme, Gordon B

Decedent

Gomme, Norman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOEFFELHOLZ, DEBRA

117 East Main

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

05/31/2018: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL (SWB)

05/31/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL (SWB)

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL (SWB) SET 6-11-18 AT 8:30AM

05/31/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL (SWB) SET 6-11-18 AT 8:30AM

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

06/11/2018: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (SWB)

06/11/2018: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (SWB)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / JUNE 13, 2018 / JUNE 20, 2018

06/20/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / JUNE 13, 2018 / JUNE 20, 2018

ORDER ADMITTING WILL, APPOINTING EXECUTOR AND DETERMINING LEGATEES, DEVISSES AND HEIRS (SWB)

06/11/2018: ORDER ADMITTING WILL, APPOINTING EXECUTOR AND DETERMINING LEGATEES, DEVISSES AND HEIRS (SWB)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / JUNE 13, 2018 / JUNE 20, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Stephen Bonner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPLTF; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (SWB); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL, APPOINTING EXECUTOR AND DETERMINING LEGATEES, DEVISSES AND HEIRS (SWB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1018961 ON 05/31/2018. PAYOR: DEBRA LOEFELHOLZ TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 204.14. LINE ITEMS: PB-2018-193: $135.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. PB-2018-193: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. PB-2018-193: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-193: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. PB-2018-193: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-193: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. PB-2018-193: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. PB-2018-193: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-193: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-193: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. PB-2018-193: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONNER, STEPHEN TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL (SWB)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loeffelholz, Debra