This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 02:46:12 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF NAOMI V HANNI, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF NAOMI filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against HANNI, DECEASED. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNI, NAOMI V

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF NAOMI V HANNI, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHAFFIN, BILL

P.O. Box 538

Davis, OK 73030

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

08/31/2020: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE; Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER PROBATE; Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less