This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 03:58:19 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF NANCY M. CARTER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF NANCY M CARTER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley, Bethany. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-44

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stanley, Bethany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Odom, Elizabeth

Decedent

Carter, Nancy M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Couch, Daniel G.

100 N. Broadway Ave, Suite 3280

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

HAMM, AUSTIN L

100 N Broadway Suite 3280

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE# PB-2020-1046 FROM OKLAHOMA COUNTY ALONG WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET AND ORIGINAL COURT FILE

01/29/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE# PB-2020-1046 FROM OKLAHOMA COUNTY ALONG WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET AND ORIGINAL COURT FILE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

11/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINING HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (BS)

11/04/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINING HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (BS)

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

10/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/ NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / OCT. 6, 2021

10/07/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/ NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / OCT. 6, 2021

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

09/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

09/15/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

09/15/2021: FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 239 (BS)

06/22/2021: ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 239 (BS)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S 239

06/16/2021: APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S 239

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

06/04/2021: INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / APRIL 14, 2021 / APRIL 21, 2021

04/28/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / APRIL 14, 2021 / APRIL 21, 2021

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

04/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

04/07/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

04/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (BS)

04/01/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (BS)

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (BS)

04/01/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (BS)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Bethany Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINING HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (BS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: CNOTE; Description: ****ENTRY IN ERROR*****PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / PUB DATE 10-22-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/ NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / OCT. 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS) SET 11-4-2-1 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE# PB-2020-1046 FROM OKLAHOMA COUNTY ALONG WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET AND ORIGINAL COURT FILE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less