This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 03:03:58 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: MILDRED LUCILLE STRICKLAND

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MILDRED LUCILLE STRICKLAND was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-29

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Defendant

THE ESTATE OF: MILDRED LUCILLE STRICKLAND

Decedent

Strickland, Mildred Lucille

 

Court Documents

PROBATE INITIAL FILING.

08/12/2021: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.

ORDER FOR HEARING

08/12/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

01/24/2022: ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

01/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

12/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER FOR HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

12/15/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

12/15/2021: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

INVENTORY

11/08/2021: INVENTORY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Strickland, Mildred Lucille

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less