This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 03/28/2022 at 10:35:04 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0062

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, MICHAEL HOWARD

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERS, MATTHEW

400 N. Broadway

Shawnee, OK 74801

 

Court Documents

FILE WILL OF MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON

06/23/2021: FILE WILL OF MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON

FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

06/28/2021: FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON

09/20/2021: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- MICHAEL HOWARD ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- JOHN MICHAEL ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER-JUSTIN JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- MALIA NOHEALANI ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less