This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 03/20/2022 at 02:30:46 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MARY JO DUNN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MARY JO DUNN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Welch, Allen J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-900

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Welch, Allen J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clark, Tracy D

Decedent

Dunn, Mary Jo

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

08/27/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

02/26/2019: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

08/27/2018: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

11/27/2018: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

TESTIMONY ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

08/27/2018: TESTIMONY ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

AMENDED PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND DETERMINATION OF HEISHIP

08/10/2018: AMENDED PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND DETERMINATION OF HEISHIP

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

08/27/2018: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

11/20/2018: DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRSHIP

08/27/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRSHIP

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACC'T; Docket: Allen J Welch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISCHARGE FILED; Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: Clark, Tracy D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINING HEIRSHIP AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCode: DISPDISCH; Description: A. WELCH: FINAL ACC'T - PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE APPEARS THROUGH COUNSEL, FINAL ACCOUNT ACCEPTED, FINAL DECREE OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE ENTERED.; Count: 1; Party: Clark, Tracy D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: MISTAKEN ENTRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less