This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 09:21:12 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF MARVIN C. ALEXANDER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MARVIN C ALEXANDER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0038

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER, MARVIN C.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF MARVIN C. ALEXANDER, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHAMP, HARRY W.

601 S. Boulder Suite 100

Tulsa,, OK 74103

MARTIN, LAWRENCE A.

123 S. Broadway

Cleveland, OK 74020

WORTEN III, JESSE J.

Po Box 1066

Bartlesville, OK 74005

 

Court Documents

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-J. WORTEN

09/22/2021: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-J. WORTEN

FILE INVENTORY AND APPRIAISEMENT

10/21/2021: FILE INVENTORY AND APPRIAISEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION IN THE PAWNEE CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE INVENTORY AND APPRIAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION IN THE PAWNEE CHIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-J. WORTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TESTAMENT OF MARVIN C ALEXANDER AND GUSSIE LAVON ALEXAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ADMITTED MUTUAL AND CONJOINT LAST WILL AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO BE APPOINTED AS P.R. WITHOUT THE NECESSITY OF A BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINDS THAT GUSSIE ALEXANDER IS A FIT AND PROPER PERSONA

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION OF PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less