This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/27/2023 at 15:51:04 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF MARK H. CANNON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF MARK H CANNON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANNON, MARK H.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF MARK H. CANNON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FLOWERS, JON

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION

01/12/2023: FILE PETITION

FILE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF MARK H. CANNON

01/12/2023: FILE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF MARK H. CANNON

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL-

01/12/2023: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL-

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITIONF OR PROBATE OF WILL

01/12/2023: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITIONF OR PROBATE OF WILL

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/13/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

01/17/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

01/23/2023: FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/23/2023: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

01/23/2023: FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

02/06/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2023: FILE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITIONF OR PROBATE OF WILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JANUARY 23, 23 @9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less