This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 08:35:51 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF LYDIA SMITH, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF LYDIA SMITH, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JETT, A. CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JETT, A. CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, LYDIA

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF LYDIA SMITH, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FLETCHER, JAMES R.

James R. Fletcher,Pllc, Po Box 627

Guymon, OK 73942

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

05/10/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ALIAS AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/NON-MAILING NOTICE TO

08/17/2021: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/NON-MAILING NOTICE TO

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

11/30/2021: PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

11/30/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND LEGATEES AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING THE DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDERING DISTRIUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7-'04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less