This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 03/07/2022 at 02:59:46 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF Lindsey D. Stowe, Deceased.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF Lindsey D Stowe, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley, Bethany. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-195

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stanley, Bethany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stowe, Gordon Ronald

Decedent

Stowe, Lindsey D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARRETT, TYLER R

131 East Main St.Ste 220

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 245 AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

05/31/2018: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 245 AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND NOTICE OF HEARING / SET 7-30-18 @ 8:30 AM (SWB)

05/31/2018: COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND NOTICE OF HEARING / SET 7-30-18 @ 8:30 AM (SWB)

ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (SWB)

05/31/2018: ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (SWB)

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION (SWB)

05/31/2018: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION (SWB)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NORMAN TRANSCRIPT - 2X 06-05-2018 06-12-2018

06/18/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NORMAN TRANSCRIPT - 2X 06-05-2018 06-12-2018

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF PROPERTY AND DISCHARGE

07/25/2018: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF PROPERTY AND DISCHARGE

ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (SWB)

07/30/2018: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (SWB)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 103232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT HD95019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Stephen Bonner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (SWB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF COMBINED NOTICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING TO CREDITORS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF PROPERTY AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NORMAN TRANSCRIPT - 2X 06-05-2018; 06-12-2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-1019023 ON 05/31/2018. PAYOR: TYLER R. BARRETT, PLCC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 204.14. LINE ITEMS: PB-2018-195: $135.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. PB-2018-195: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. PB-2018-195: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-195: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. PB-2018-195: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-195: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. PB-2018-195: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. PB-2018-195: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-195: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2018-195: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. PB-2018-195: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONNER, STEPHEN TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 245 AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less