This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 12/18/2022 at 07:49:24 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF LINDA SUE MACK, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF LINDA SUE MACK, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACK, LINDA SUE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF LINDA SUE MACK, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GIBBARD, ELAINE

P.O. Box 436

Sulphur, OK 73086

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES TO KNOWN CREDITORS

09/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES TO KNOWN CREDITORS

FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE

12/03/2020: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

12/03/2020: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

12/03/2020: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

07/08/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

09/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

09/20/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

ORDER WAIVING THE FILING OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND

09/21/2021: ORDER WAIVING THE FILING OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND

NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

10/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

10/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS AND

10/13/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS AND

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, FOR DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPRAISAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER WAIVING THE FILING OF GENERAL INVENTORY AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less