This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/10/2022 at 12:55:16 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF LARRY THOMAS COOPER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF LARRY THOMAS COOPER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0112

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, LARRY THOMAS

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF LARRY THOMAS COOPER, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VANDEVER, BILLY D

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

113 N Willow

Pauls Valley, OK 73075

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATIVE

11/12/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATIVE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADMINISTRATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATIVE (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINING HEIRS (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPOINTING CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION PVD $48.15 10/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE FOR HRG PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less