This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 01:56:20 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN V. CARVER A/K/A KATHRYN VIRGINIA CARVER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against CARVER A/K/A KATHRYN VIRGINIA CARVER, DECEASED. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Welch, Allen J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1060

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Welch, Allen J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wade, Taryn B

Decedent

Carver, Kathryn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SPENCER, KATIE M

Ball Morse Lowe, 531 Couch Drive Ste 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO TARYN B WADE/ JUDGE WELCH

07/21/2021: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO TARYN B WADE/ JUDGE WELCH

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

07/21/2021: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

07/21/2021: ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNTING, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

07/21/2021: COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNTING, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

07/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12021622---PUBLISHER'S FEE $131.37---PAID DIRECT

08/02/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12021622---PUBLISHER'S FEE $131.37---PAID DIRECT

FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCPOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

09/08/2021: FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCPOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

09/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

09/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

09/21/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACC'T / SUM. ADM.; Docket: Allen J Welch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Carver, Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: A. WELCH: FINAL ACC'T / SUM. ADM. - SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR APPEARS THROUGH COUNSEL, WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE, FINAL ACCOUNT ACCEPTED, FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, HEIRSHIP AND DISCHARGE ENTERED.; Count: 1; Party: Carver, Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCPOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12021622---PUBLISHER'S FEE $131.37---PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING COMBINED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: OTHER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Carver, Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER, KATIE M