This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 04:31:44 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN BETHENE MOSES, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN BETHENE MOSES, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0094

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSES, KATHRYN BETHENE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN BETHENE MOSES, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

READNOUR, KEITH

Po Box 642

Pauls Valley, OK 73075

 

Court Documents

ORDER & NOTICE OF HRG PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

08/09/2021: ORDER & NOTICE OF HRG PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

RECEIPT- (LENDA C TAYLOR)

04/14/2022: RECEIPT- (LENDA C TAYLOR)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RECEIPT- (GRADY R TAYLOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RECEIPT- (LENDA C TAYLOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ESTATE AND DISCHARGING AND RELEASING PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES, DISTRIBUTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT AND FINAL DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER & NOTICE OF HRG ETC AFFID OF PUB/PVD $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCHARGING AND RELEASING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer READNOUR, KEITH