This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 09:07:59 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF JUDY BETH GODFREY, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JUDY BETH GODFREY, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BALDWIN, THOMAS K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BALDWIN, THOMAS K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GODFREY, JUDY BETH

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF JUDY BETH GODFREY, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, BRADLEY

Attorney at MORDY & MORDY PC

Po Box 457

Ardmore, OK 73402

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

03/07/2022: FILE & ENTER PETITION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES, FILED

03/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES, FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEVISEES AND LEGATEES, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AND DETERMINING HEIRS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ADMITTING ESTATE TO PROBATE, APPOINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON, BRADLEY