This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 00:10:37 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JUDITH JENNETTE FREER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JUDITH JENNETTE FREER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Dishman, C. Brent and Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1008

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Dishman, C. Brent

Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Freer, Amos Jacob

Defendant

THE ESTATE OF JUDITH JENNETTE FREER, DECEASED

Decedent

Freer, Judith Jennette

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 245 AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

07/12/2021: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 245 AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JUDITH J. FREER

07/12/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JUDITH J. FREER

GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

07/12/2021: GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS, NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ACCOUNTING, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

07/12/2021: COMBINED NOTICE TO CREDITORS, NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ACCOUNTING, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIUNISTRATION ISSUED TO AMOS JACOB FREER/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

07/22/2021: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIUNISTRATION ISSUED TO AMOS JACOB FREER/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12020924---PUBLISHERS FEE $84.10---PAID DIRECT

08/06/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12020924---PUBLISHERS FEE $84.10---PAID DIRECT

JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS FREER CONT TO 10-4-21 @ 1:30 FO PROPER NOTICE AND OR CONSENTS FROM OTHER 2 HEIRS

08/16/2021: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS FREER CONT TO 10-4-21 @ 1:30 FO PROPER NOTICE AND OR CONSENTS FROM OTHER 2 HEIRS

JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS JACOB FREER OTHER 2 HEIRS HAVE PROVIDED AFFIDAVITS THAT THEY HAVE RECEIVED NOTICE AND CONSENT TO THR APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER ALL NOTICES COMPLETED

10/04/2021: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS JACOB FREER OTHER 2 HEIRS HAVE PROVIDED AFFIDAVITS THAT THEY HAVE RECEIVED NOTICE AND CONSENT TO THR APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER ALL NOTICES COMPLETED

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO AMOS JACOB FREER/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

10/04/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO AMOS JACOB FREER/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

10/04/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT

10/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

10/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 119596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Freer, Judith Jennette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPLTF; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO AMOS JACOB FREER/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK; Count: 1; Party: Freer, Judith Jennette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS JACOB FREER OTHER 2 HEIRS HAVE PROVIDED AFFIDAVITS THAT THEY HAVE RECEIVED NOTICE AND CONSENT TO THR APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER ALL NOTICES COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: SA; Docket: K. Nikki Kirkpatrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - AMOS FREER CONT TO 10-4-21 @ 1:30 FO PROPER NOTICE AND OR CONSENTS FROM OTHER 2 HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12020924---PUBLISHER;S FEE $84.10---PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less