This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 07/18/2022 at 20:03:09 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF JOYCE FLUELLEN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOYCE FLUELLEN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLUELLEN, JOYCE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF JOYCE FLUELLEN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOLF, FRANK III

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P O Box 726

Hugo, OK 74743

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING PEITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT SERVICE AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPOINTING EXECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF, FRANK III