This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 01/12/2022 at 08:20:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH DAMON CALE, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH DAMON CALE, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0030

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALE, JOSEPH DAMON

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH DAMON CALE, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LANCE, LANCE TIMOTHY

1027 W. Broadwaypo Box 861

Sulphur, OK 73086

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMING HEIRSHIP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less