This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 13:02:33 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF JIMMY RAY MOORE, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JIMMY RAY MOORE, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0128

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORE, JIMMY RAY

MOORE, ELIZABETH ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GULESERIAN, RENT

GULESERIAN, TRENT

Attorney at STUART & CLOVER, PLLC

128 N. Broadway

Shawnee, OK 74802

 

Court Documents

FILE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ELIZABETH A. MOORE

12/15/2020: FILE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ELIZABETH A. MOORE

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

01/06/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

01/06/2021: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

FILE GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

11/17/2021: FILE GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS TO PRESENT CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY- JASON PHARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY-KENNETH JEGELEWICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GULESERIAN, TRENT