This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 10:10:31 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Jewell D Evans, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 In the Matter of the Estate of Jewell D Evans, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, Katherine E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-142

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, Katherine E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Decedent

Evans, Jewell D

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

EVANS, RICHARD A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Hunter, Rebecca Wood

Attorney at Rebecca Wood Hunter, PLLC

Po Box 1107

Coweta, OK 74429

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ADMISSION OF THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JEWELL DEAN EVANS AKA JEWELL DEAN EVANS

12/14/2020: AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ADMISSION OF THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JEWELL DEAN EVANS AKA JEWELL DEAN EVANS

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

12/28/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (JUDGE THOMAS)

01/12/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY (JUDGE THOMAS)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/04/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PETITION FOR PROBATE FO WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

12/14/2020: PETITION FOR PROBATE FO WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

12/14/2020: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JEWELL D EVANS

12/14/2020: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JEWELL D EVANS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/12/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER ALLOWING COMMISSIONS TO THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

05/05/2022: ORDER ALLOWING COMMISSIONS TO THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER ALLOWING REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES OF THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

05/05/2022: ORDER ALLOWING REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES OF THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

05/05/2022: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/29/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

03/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

03/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER FOR HEARING

03/18/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING

ORDER FOR HEARING

03/18/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING

ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

03/18/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING COMMISSIONS TO THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES OF THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: Final Account, Petition for Decree of distribution of Estate and discharge of personal representative: Application for Reimbursement for expenses: Application for Commissions:; Party: EVANS,RICHARDA; Docket: Katherine E. Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE THOMAS: THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: APPLICATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES: APPICATION FOR COMMISSIONS. RICHARD EVANS APPEARS BY ATTORNEY, REBECCA HUNTER. JUDGE TAKES MATTER UNDER ADVISEMENT.; Party: EVANS, RICHARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE FO WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Evans, Jewell D; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less