This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 03:37:38 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE LYNN MCALVAIN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE LYNN MCALVAIN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCALVAIN, JACQUELINE LYNN

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE LYNN MCALVAIN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTER, M. BRADLEY

P.O. Box 1508

Seminole, OK 74818

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ORDER OF HEARING ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL

11/19/2019: AMENDED ORDER OF HEARING ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - BUTNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXPENSES, APPROVAL OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S FEE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S FEE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES, APPROVAL OF

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TENANCY; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES, TERMINATION OF JOINT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, DETERMINATION OF; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less