This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:34:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF HUSBAND AND WIFE, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF HUSBAND AND WIFE, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DIRICKSON, DONNA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0098

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DIRICKSON, DONNA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRY, VIRGINIA K.

FRY, EDWARD A.

HUSBAND AND WIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MINTON III, M L

Po Box 648, 400 E Main

Weatherford, OK 73096

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING JOINT PETITION FIL & SCANNED

11/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING JOINT PETITION FIL & SCANNED

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FIL & SCANNED

12/06/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FIL & SCANNED

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FIL & SCANNED

12/06/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FIL & SCANNED

JOINT NOTICE TO CREDITORS FIL & SCANNED

12/06/2021: JOINT NOTICE TO CREDITORS FIL & SCANNED

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINSTRATOR AND PERSONAL

12/06/2021: ORDER APPOINTING ADMINSTRATOR AND PERSONAL

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE FIL & SCANNED

12/06/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE FIL & SCANNED

MEMORANDUM OF ALLOWANCE AND ORDER FIL & SCANNED

12/29/2021: MEMORANDUM OF ALLOWANCE AND ORDER FIL & SCANNED

AUTHENTICATED CLAIM FIL & SCANNED

12/29/2021: AUTHENTICATED CLAIM FIL & SCANNED

JOINT FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING

04/01/2022: JOINT FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING

ORDER FIXING TIME FOR HEARING JOINT FINAL ACCOUNT,

04/01/2022: ORDER FIXING TIME FOR HEARING JOINT FINAL ACCOUNT,

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FIIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED - NOTICE OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF ESTATE, AND FINAL DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATION FIL & S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & LAST WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less