This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 01:56:53 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF HARLAN N. TABB, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF HARLAN N TABB, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY, CLARK E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUEY, CLARK E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TABB, HARLAN N.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF HARLAN N. TABB, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COKE, MARK T.

205 W. Cypress, P.O. Box 652

Altus, OK 73522

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

06/17/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

06/28/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR AND DETERMINATION

06/28/2021: ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR AND DETERMINATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

06/28/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ASSIGNMENT OF INTREST

08/09/2021: ASSIGNMENT OF INTREST

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUPPLEMENT TO FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COKE, MARK T.