This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 10:28:26 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Greg L Smith, Deceased.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 In the Matter of the Estate of Greg L Smith, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Worthington, Susan C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-71

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Worthington, Susan C.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Smith, Cheryl L

Smith, Gracynn

Decedent

Smith, Greg L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hirzel, Jeff (Bar ##4236)

P.O. Box 279

Guthrie, OK 73044

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION TO APPROVE WAIVER AS TO INTERIM AND FINAL ACCOUNTGS AND NOTICES

09/25/2018: APPLICATION TO APPROVE WAIVER AS TO INTERIM AND FINAL ACCOUNTGS AND NOTICES

APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISERS

09/25/2018: APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISERS

DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISTRIBUTION - 2CC

01/07/2020: DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISTRIBUTION - 2CC

ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION

12/11/2019: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS OF DECEDENT

09/25/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS OF DECEDENT

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

09/25/2018: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

08/29/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

08/29/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

08/29/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION; Party: Smith,CherylL; Docket: Susan C. Worthington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DECR; Description: DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISTRIBUTION - 2CC; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION "NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION" (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER 12/14/19 & 12/21/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT FOR DISTRIBUTION AND TO DETERMINE HEIRSHIP; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAPDH; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT; Party: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE TO CREDITORS (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - SEPTEMBER 27 & OCTOBER 4, 2018); Party: Smith, Greg L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING PETITOIN FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRTION; Party: Smith,GregL; Docket: Susan C. Worthington

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND DETERMINING HEIRS; Count: 1; Party: Smith, Greg L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Smith, Cheryl L

    Read MoreRead Less