This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 17:50:10 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF GLORIA JUNE POOLE, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF GLORIA JUNE POOLE, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FARLEY, KENNETH R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FARLEY, KENNETH R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOLE, GLORIA JUNE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF GLORIA JUNE POOLE, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PRATT, JUSTIN R.

2108 Se Washington Suite B

Idabel, OK 74745

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/10/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

06/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

10/25/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

NOTICE AND ORDER FOR HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND

10/25/2021: NOTICE AND ORDER FOR HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

12/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

12/09/2021: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DECREE OF DETERMINATION OF

12/17/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DECREE OF DETERMINATION OF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingEvent: MD - FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF DISTRIBTION OF ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS, DEVEES OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES,DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DECREE OF DETERMINATION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: MD - FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE-EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less