This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 10/02/2022 at 13:29:01 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF GILBERT VILLA ALONZO, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF GILBERT VILLA ALONZO, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICKY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0037

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICKY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALONZO, GILBERT VILLA

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF GILBERT VILLA ALONZO, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GENTRY, WILLIAM E. (BILL)

P.O. Box 839

Hobart, OK 73651

 

Court Documents

FILED ORDER ALLOWING AND SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNT, ORDER

05/24/2022: FILED ORDER ALLOWING AND SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNT, ORDER

FILED AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATIONS

05/23/2022: FILED AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATIONS

FILED AMENDED NOTICE

04/26/2022: FILED AMENDED NOTICE

FILED AMENDED ORDER

04/26/2022: FILED AMENDED ORDER

FILED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

04/14/2022: FILED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILED ORDER

04/14/2022: FILED ORDER

FILED NOTICE

04/14/2022: FILED NOTICE

FILED FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,

04/12/2022: FILED FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,

FILED GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

04/04/2022: FILED GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

FILED AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

01/31/2022: FILED AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/03/2022: FILED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILED NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/03/2022: FILED NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILED ORDER APPOINTING APPRAISERS

01/03/2022: FILED ORDER APPOINTING APPRAISERS

FILED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

01/03/2022: FILED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

FILED CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

01/03/2022: FILED CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

FILED CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

01/03/2022: FILED CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

FILED ORDER APPOINTING APPRAISERS

01/03/2022: FILED ORDER APPOINTING APPRAISERS

FILED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

01/03/2022: FILED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE, ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE, AND FINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORDER ALLOWING AND SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNT, ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AMENDED NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT (NEW 7-1-04); Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: `LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less