This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 01:18:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF GERALD DAVID MARIS, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF GERALD DAVID MARIS, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHNEITER, LANCE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0092

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SCHNEITER, LANCE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIS, GERALD DAVID

MARIS, CAROL ANN

Other

MARIS, CURTIS DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FOSTER, ZACHARY J

Attorney at MAHAFFEY & GORE PC

300 Ne 1St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - KGFR TIMES & FREE PRESS - $88.86

12/30/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - KGFR TIMES & FREE PRESS - $88.86

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR CREDITORS AND

02/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR CREDITORS AND

APPOINTMENT OF AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT PERSONAL

02/02/2021: APPOINTMENT OF AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT PERSONAL

AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/02/2021: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONFIRMATION OF SALE UNDER POWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION, DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING AND ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION- KGFR TIMES & FREE PRESS- $124.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less