This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 06:03:56 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF GARY VIRGIL WILSON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF GARY VIRGIL WILSON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0026

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, GARY VIRGIL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF GARY VIRGIL WILSON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PHILLIPS, CYNTHIA A.

207 North Main Street

Sand Springs, OK 74063

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

05/28/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DETERMINING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILL AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS AT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less