This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 01:12:04 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCES G. NORTON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCES G NORTON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Glassco, Kurt G and Musseman, William J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-517

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Glassco, Kurt G

Musseman, William J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Schneider, Jesse

Decedent

Norton, Frances G

Interested Party

LEWIS, SHANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Joyce, Kevin Brian

Attorney at THE JOYCE LAW FIRM

515 S Main St., Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74103

HAUGER, CHRISTOPHER B.

Attorney at JOYCE & GRADDY, PLLC

515 South Main Street, Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74103

Interested Party Attorneys

BURKE, TAYLOR A

525 S. Main, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

CASH, ADRIENNE

525 S. Main Street, Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

Other Attorneys

GRADDY, MARK K.

Attorney at JOYCE & GRADDY, PLLC

515 South Main Street, Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

06/03/2022: ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KENT HEAD

06/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KENT HEAD

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ELIZABETH NORTON

06/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ELIZABETH NORTON

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - MAY 1, 8, 2022 - TW

06/01/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - MAY 1, 8, 2022 - TW

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - JULY 1, 8, 2021 - TW

06/01/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - JULY 1, 8, 2021 - TW

NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE - JUNE 3, 2022 @ 11:00 AM - TW

04/26/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE - JUNE 3, 2022 @ 11:00 AM - TW

FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

03/07/2022: FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHDRAWAL OF CREDITOR CLAIM

01/24/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHDRAWAL OF CREDITOR CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 3, 2022 @ 2:00 PM COURTROOM 706 - W/AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 3, 2022 @ 2:00 PM COURTROOM 706 - W/AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING

01/14/2022: APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING

CREDITOR'S CLAIM/BILL - IN EXCESS OF $1,000,000.00 EXHIBITS ATTACHED

11/03/2021: CREDITOR'S CLAIM/BILL - IN EXCESS OF $1,000,000.00 EXHIBITS ATTACHED

CREDITOR'S CLAIM/BILL - ELEPHANT TRUNK - $2,277.32

10/20/2021: CREDITOR'S CLAIM/BILL - ELEPHANT TRUNK - $2,277.32

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

10/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - CHRISTOPHER B. HAUGER OF JOYCE AND GRADDY, PLLC FOR JESSE SCHNEIDER

10/07/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - CHRISTOPHER B. HAUGER OF JOYCE AND GRADDY, PLLC FOR JESSE SCHNEIDER

NOTICE TO CREDITORS - PRESENTMENT DATE - DECEMBER 13, 2021 - TW

10/07/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS - PRESENTMENT DATE - DECEMBER 13, 2021 - TW

LIS PENDENS

10/05/2021: LIS PENDENS

ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 239 AND 388

09/17/2021: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 58 O.S. 239 AND 388

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT - PET - KAVIN JOYCE, MARK GRADDY, CHRISTOPHER HAUGER .. INT. PARTY - TAYLOR BURK; Docket: Civil Docket D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Norton, Frances G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION ENTERED.; Count: 1; Party: Norton, Frances G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: SMITH, CLIFFORD: HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT HELD. KEVIN JOYCE APPEARS FOR PETITIONER. TAYLOR BURK APPEARS FOR INTERESTED PARTY. ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KENT HEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ELIZABETH NORTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - MAY 1, 8, 2022 - TW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - JULY 1, 8, 2021 - TW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL REPORT AND PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE - JUNE 3, 2022 @ 11:00 AM - TW

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Schneider, Jesse

    Read MoreRead Less