This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 07:43:35 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF FLORENCE D. RUSSELL, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF FLORENCE D RUSSELL, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0087

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL, FLORENCE D.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF FLORENCE D. RUSSELL, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEEDN, JOHN M.

2 North Main St, Suite 600

Miami, OK 74354

 

Court Documents

CM: LETTER AND ORDER SIGNED

10/15/2021: CM: LETTER AND ORDER SIGNED

STATEMENT OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM

11/01/2021: STATEMENT OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

04/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR AMENDED ORDER

05/10/2022: APPLICATION FOR AMENDED ORDER

AMENDED ORDER APPROVING PETITION DETERMINING HEIRSHIP

05/10/2022: AMENDED ORDER APPROVING PETITION DETERMINING HEIRSHIP

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED ORDER APPROVING PETITION DETERMINING HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR AMENDED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: ORDER GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING PETITION DETERMINING HEIRSHIP AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP AND DISTRIBUTION - 05/03/22 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less