This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 12:03:35 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EVA ANNE REED, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EVA ANNE REED, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki and Dishman, C. Brent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1130

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki

Dishman, C. Brent

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rutledge, Steven Dean

Defendant

THE ESTATE OF EVA ANNE REED, DECEASED

Decedent

Reed, Eva Anne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LANE, PATRICK H

Ball Morse Lowe, 531 Couch Drive, Suite 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

SPENCER, KATIE M

Ball Morse Lowe, 531 Couch Drive Ste 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Wright, Jennifer L

Ball Morse Lowe, 531 Couch Drive Suite 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTLING ESTATE, ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, ALLOWING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

03/09/2022: ORDER SETTLING ESTATE, ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, ALLOWING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

JUDGE KIRBY - CALEB STILES APPEAR ON BEHALF OF STEVEN RUTLEDGE FINAL ACCOUNT APPROVED/ DISCHARGE APPROVED/ ATTY FEES APPROVED

03/09/2022: JUDGE KIRBY - CALEB STILES APPEAR ON BEHALF OF STEVEN RUTLEDGE FINAL ACCOUNT APPROVED/ DISCHARGE APPROVED/ ATTY FEES APPROVED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORED---ORD #12087911---PUBLISHER'S FEE $68.44---PAID DIRECT

02/25/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORED---ORD #12087911---PUBLISHER'S FEE $68.44---PAID DIRECT

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY CALEB R STILES FOR PETITIONER

02/14/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY CALEB R STILES FOR PETITIONER

ORDER FOR HEARING FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

02/14/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

02/14/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

02/14/2022: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

10/15/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

10/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

10/08/2021: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12036628---PUBLISHER'S FEE $48.14---PAID DIRECT

09/24/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12036628---PUBLISHER'S FEE $48.14---PAID DIRECT

ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REALPROPERTY, WAIVING THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRIASEMENT

09/14/2021: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REALPROPERTY, WAIVING THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRIASEMENT

APPLICATION FOR SALE OF PROPERTY PURSUANT TO TITLE 58 O.S. 239 AND FOR ORDER TO WAIVE THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

09/14/2021: APPLICATION FOR SALE OF PROPERTY PURSUANT TO TITLE 58 O.S. 239 AND FOR ORDER TO WAIVE THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS

09/14/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

09/14/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

09/14/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

APPOINTMENT OF RESIDENT AGENT

09/14/2021: APPOINTMENT OF RESIDENT AGENT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE; Docket: Richard Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETTLING ESTATE, ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, ALLOWING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE KIRBY - CALEB STILES APPEAR ON BEHALF OF STEVEN RUTLEDGE FINAL ACCOUNT APPROVED/ DISCHARGE APPROVED/ ATTY FEES APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORED---ORD #12087911---PUBLISHER'S FEE $68.44---PAID DIRECT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY CALEB R STILES FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PEFO; Description: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 119596

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER, KATIE M