This case was last updated from Beckham County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 05:42:21 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF EUGENE BENTON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EUGENE BENTON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Beckham County Courts, Beckham County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Beckham, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENTON, EUGENE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF EUGENE BENTON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

IVESTER, MR. JACK W.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Po Box 160

Sayre, OK 73662

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION-BECKHAM COUNTY RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: FINAL DECREE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS OF DECEDENT AND DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND FINAL ACCOUNT APPROVED. MKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITNER APPEARS THROUGH IVESTER. DECREE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDER MINUTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less