This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 03:15:29 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF EUAL EDWARD CAMP, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EUAL EDWARD CAMP, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0121

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMP, EUAL EDWARD

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF EUAL EDWARD CAMP, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEBB, CREGG

400 N. Broadway

Shawnee, OK 74801

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION

09/20/2021: FILE PETITION

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITIN FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

09/20/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITIN FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

09/27/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

10/18/2021: FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

FILE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND

01/27/2022: FILE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/14/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER AQLLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISTRIBUTION- FEB. 28, 22 @9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBB, CREGG