This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 03/24/2022 at 22:59:28 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF ERICA JADE NOBLITT

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF ERICA JADE NOBLITT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley, Bethany. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stanley, Bethany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hopeman, Todd Alan

Decedent

Noblitt, Erica Jade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Devilliers, J Matthew

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES

01/19/2021: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES, AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY. HEARING SET 2-11-21 AT 9:00AM (BS)

01/19/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES, AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY. HEARING SET 2-11-21 AT 9:00AM (BS)

NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES. HEARING SET 2-11-21 AT 9:00AM

01/19/2021: NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES. HEARING SET 2-11-21 AT 9:00AM

FINAL ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS)

07/22/2021: FINAL ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF COMBINED NOTICE: NO KNOWN CREDITOR

07/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF COMBINED NOTICE: NO KNOWN CREDITOR

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / TODD ALAN HOPEMAN

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / TODD ALAN HOPEMAN

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / ANGELA MAYES

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / ANGELA MAYES

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / BELYNDA KILHOFFER

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / BELYNDA KILHOFFER

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER RILEY

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER RILEY

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER HOLLJE

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER HOLLJE

WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / DARLINE SELLERS

07/22/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / DARLINE SELLERS

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

DISCLAIMER AND ASSIGNMENT

07/22/2021: DISCLAIMER AND ASSIGNMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / 6-30-2021, 7-7-2021

07/09/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / 6-30-2021, 7-7-2021

PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

06/25/2021: PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

DISCLAIMER AND ASSIGNMENT

06/25/2021: DISCLAIMER AND ASSIGNMENT

ORDER FIXING TIME FOR HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERIMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE. HEARING DATE 7-22-21 AT 9:00AM. (BS)

06/25/2021: ORDER FIXING TIME FOR HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERIMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE. HEARING DATE 7-22-21 AT 9:00AM. (BS)

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE. HEARING DATE 7-22-21 AT 9:00AM. (BS)

06/25/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE. HEARING DATE 7-22-21 AT 9:00AM. (BS)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Bethany Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FO; Description: FINAL ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE (BS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF COMBINED NOTICE: NO KNOWN CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / TODD ALAN HOPEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / ANGELA MAYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / BELYNDA KILHOFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / JENNIFER HOLLJE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING / DARLINE SELLERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less