This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 00:48:57 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EDWARD EUGENE NOVOTNY, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EDWARD EUGENE NOVOTNY, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Canadian, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Strubhar, Khristan K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3-46

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Strubhar, Khristan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

Decedent

NOVOTNY, EDWARD EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODGERS, JEFF

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

02/24/2023: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

02/27/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

03/02/2023: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

03/02/2023: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

03/02/2023: NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FILED

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FILED

 

Docket Entries

03/02/2023

HearingEvent: PETITION FOR PROBATE // APPOINTMENT OF P.R.; Docket: Khristan K. Strubhar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: NOVOTNY, EDWARD EUGENE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: ANM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: LTL; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: OAW; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
02/06/2023

DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.// PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1; Party: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: NOVOTNY, KAY ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less