This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:09:56 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF EARLENE UPCHURCH, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF EARLENE UPCHURCH, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HOGAN, MIKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0105

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HOGAN, MIKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UPCHURCH, EARLENE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF EARLENE UPCHURCH, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAYDEN, BILL

P.O.Box 1348

Mcalester, OK 74502

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL ON

07/26/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL ON

NOTICE FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL ON

07/26/2021: NOTICE FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL ON

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE. S/HOGAN

09/01/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE. S/HOGAN

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

03/30/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION. S/HOGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR MARCH 30, 2022 AT 9AM. S/HOGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR MARCH 30, 2022 AT 9AM. S/HOGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: F & E PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON-COMPUTER CASE AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAYDEN, BILL