This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 03:03:39 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Donald Kincaid, deceased

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 In the Matter of the Estate of Donald Kincaid, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Worthington, Susan C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-33

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Worthington, Susan C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kincaid, Murial

Decedent

Kincaid, David

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

04/15/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

04/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

04/15/2021: PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW

FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINING HEIRSHIP FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

10/05/2021: FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINING HEIRSHIP FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER, SEPT 22 & 29, 2021)

10/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER, SEPT 22 & 29, 2021)

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

09/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINATOIN OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

09/10/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINATOIN OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

09/10/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACOUNT DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

09/10/2021: PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACOUNT DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST

09/10/2021: ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST

09/10/2021: ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST

GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

09/10/2021: GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE TO CREDITORS (THE LOGAN COUNTY COURIER, MAY 27 & JUNE 3, 2021)

06/10/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE TO CREDITORS (THE LOGAN COUNTY COURIER, MAY 27 & JUNE 3, 2021)

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

05/25/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

05/25/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS AT LAW

05/25/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS AT LAW

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

04/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE OF HERING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS AT LAW (THE LOGAN COUNTY COURIER, APRIL 22, 2021)

04/26/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE OF HERING PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS AT LAW (THE LOGAN COUNTY COURIER, APRIL 22, 2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Party: Kincaid,Murial; Docket: Susan C. Worthington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FO; Description: FINAL ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT; DETERMINING HEIRSHIP; FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - PUBLISHED NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP; AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER, SEPT 22 & 29, 2021); Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT; DETERMINATOIN OF HEIRSHIP; AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT; DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP; AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACOUNT; DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP; AND FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF HEIRS-AT-LAW; Count: 1; Party: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Kincaid, Murial

    Read MoreRead Less