This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 04/05/2022 at 07:58:59 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DONALD G. WILLIAMS, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DONALD G WILLIAMS, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, S. WYATT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0038

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, S. WYATT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS, DONALD G.

WILLIAMS, JOAN E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUZBEE UPCHURCH SQUIRES & EAST

Attorney at BUZBEE UPCHURCH SQUIRES & EAST

P O Box 765, 203 West Broadway

Anadarko, OK 73005

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCOUNT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND FINAL DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1% PDG; Amount: $ 0.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Amount: $ 69.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACCOUNT DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF THE IDENTITY OF THE HEIRS AT LAW; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less