This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/07/2022 at 02:38:22 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DELORES M SCHULZ, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DELORES M SCHULZ, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHULZ, DELORES M

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF DELORES M SCHULZ, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOLF, FRANK III

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P O Box 726

Hugo, OK 74743

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES

11/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPOINTING EXECUTRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF FOREIGN WILL AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF, FRANK III