This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 01:01:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DECEASED, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DECEASED, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is INGE, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

INGE, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID WOOD

AND MARJORIE ANN WOOD, ALSO

KNOWN AS MARJORIE WOOD

DECEASED

KNOWN AS MARJORIE A. WOOD, ALSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS, HOMAS C. ATTY

WILLIAMS, THOMAS C. ATTY

Attorney at ROBERTSON & WILLIAMS

9658 N. May Avenue, Ste. 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR COMBINDED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL

01/05/2021: ORDER FOR COMBINDED NOTICE AND ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING OF COMBINED

03/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING OF COMBINED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING OF COMBINED

03/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING OF COMBINED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - PROBATE/ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING OF COMBINED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTING ESTATES AND DISCHARGING SPECIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEVISEES AND LEGATEES, WAIVER OF FINAL ACCOUNT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, DETERMINING HEIRS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less