This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/26/2023 at 22:11:09 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DAVID NEAL JOHNSON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DAVID NEAL JOHNSON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, DAVID NEAL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF DAVID NEAL JOHNSON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RODGERS, JEFF

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION

01/13/2023: FILE PETITION

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

02/08/2023: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

02/08/2023: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

FILE PETITION TO SELL

02/27/2023: FILE PETITION TO SELL

FILE ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND

02/27/2023: FILE ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND

FILE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- BEVERLY JOHNSON

02/27/2023: FILE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- BEVERLY JOHNSON

FILE ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL

02/27/2023: FILE ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL

FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/27/2023: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/27/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/27/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

03/13/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROPERTY (58 O.S. 239)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL AND PERSONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- BEVERLY JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less