This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 11:06:31 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF AND, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF AND, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JETT, A. CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JETT, A. CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON, DARRIN CRAIG

AND

WILSON, DODGE

AKA

WILSON SR, FRANKLIN DODGE

A/K/A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HICKS, CORY B.

Attorney at FIELD & HICKS

Po Box 1347

Guymon, OK 73942

 

Court Documents

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO POBATE, APPOINTING

03/25/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO POBATE, APPOINTING

DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT

03/25/2021: DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/25/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER

03/25/2021: ORDER

ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE

09/03/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: PREV QTR COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7-'04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, AND DETERMINATION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND LETTERS OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF ADMINISTRATOR AND ADMINISTRATOR WITH WITLL ANNEXED,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR ADMISSION OF WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less