This case was last updated from Pontotoc County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 22:15:43 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DARRELL HENRY BOLICH, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DARRELL HENRY BOLICH, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pontotoc County Courts, Pontotoc County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JACKSON, LORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0055

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pontotoc, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JACKSON, LORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLICH, DARRELL HENRY

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF DARRELL HENRY BOLICH, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCRIVNER, JAMES R.

P. O. Box 1373, 120 East 14Th Street

Ada, OK 74821

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARISHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION ($58.54)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT,

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY JAMES R. SCRIVNER CK $204.14

    Read MoreRead Less