This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 21:01:52 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA ANN LEE, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA ANN LEE, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BALDWIN, THOMAS K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BALDWIN, THOMAS K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, CYNTHIA ANN

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA ANN LEE, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, BRADLEY

Attorney at MORDY & MORDY PC

Po Box 457

Ardmore, OK 73402

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE, FILED

02/28/2022: ORDER FOR COMBINED NOTICE, FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATOR, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING SPECIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION OF PROPERTY, AND DISCHARGE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICES TO CREDITORS, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON, BRADLEY