This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 11/10/2021 at 03:45:52 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CREOLA M. WELLS & BARBARA J WALKER, DECEASED PERSONS

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CREOLA M WELLS BARBARA J WALKER, DECEASED PERSONS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Welch, Allen J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1305

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Welch, Allen J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dewberry, Rachael

Norman, OK 73069

Decedents

Wells, Creola M

Walker, Barbara J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DEWBERRY, RACHAEL

Attorney at Dewberry Law Firm PLLC

2425 Wilcox Drive

Norman, OK 73069

Morrison, Aaron

Attorney at DEWBERRY LAW FIRM, PLLC

2425 Wilcox Drive

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

12/09/2020: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

FINAL ACCOUNT & PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION

12/11/2020: FINAL ACCOUNT & PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION

ORDER APPROVING SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, DETERMINING HEIRS AT LAW, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES, & DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR

02/03/2021: ORDER APPROVING SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, DETERMINING HEIRS AT LAW, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES, & DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR

CONSENT AND WAIVER TO SERVE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

12/10/2020: CONSENT AND WAIVER TO SERVE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES

12/11/2020: ORDER FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES

PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP

12/09/2020: PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP

COMBINED NOTICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS NOTICE OF HEARING-PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION & DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT

12/11/2020: COMBINED NOTICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS NOTICE OF HEARING-PETITION FOR JOINT SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION & DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

12/09/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE

12/09/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF FUNDS - DARREN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACC'T / SUM. ADM.; Docket: Allen J Welch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Walker, Barbara J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: A. WELCH: FINAL ACC'T / SUM. ADM. - SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR APPEARS THROUGH COUNSEL, FINAL DECREE IN SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE ENTERED.; Count: 1; Party: Walker, Barbara J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, DETERMINING HEIRS AT LAW, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES, & DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SIDERIAS - ATTY MARK MITCHELL ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER GREG PALMER. COURT CLER INCORRECTLY ASSIGNED THIS CASE NUMBER PB-20-1305 TO THE ESTATE OF JAMES ALLEN PALMER. THE CASE NUMBER SHOULD HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED AS PB-20-1306. ORDER NUC PRO TUNC ENTERED SHOWING THAT THE ESTATE OF JAMES ALLEN PALMER IS ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER PB-20-1306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION JOURNAL RECORD $163.27 PD #11944398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Walker, Barbara J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT & PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dewberry, Rachael