This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 03:05:21 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF CLOURISE SHAEFFER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CLOURISE SHAEFFER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAEFFER, CLOURISE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF CLOURISE SHAEFFER, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMITH, PHILLIP K.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

8906 East Skelly Drive

Tulsa, OK 74129

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/10/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

CM:DG:NOCSR, 4-22-19 - HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT - PERSONAL

04/29/2019: CM:DG:NOCSR, 4-22-19 - HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT - PERSONAL

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

07/24/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

RECEIPT OF LEGACY-JUDITH A MCINTIRE

04/22/2019: RECEIPT OF LEGACY-JUDITH A MCINTIRE

ORDER AND NOTICE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT-4-22-19-2:00

04/01/2019: ORDER AND NOTICE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT-4-22-19-2:00

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL

04/22/2019: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL

ASSIGNMENT OF LEGACY

04/02/2019: ASSIGNMENT OF LEGACY

CONSENT OF DAVID GLEN SHAEFFER

09/05/2018: CONSENT OF DAVID GLEN SHAEFFER

FINAL DISCHARGE

04/22/2019: FINAL DISCHARGE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILING OF CONSENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HAVE BEEN MADE. FINAL DISCHARGE SHOULD BE ENTERED UPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION IS ENTERED. COURT FINDS DISTRIBUTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL ACCOUNTIS EXAMINED AND APPROVED. FINAL DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS ARE CONFIRMED. NO OBJECTIONS TO FINAL ACCOUNT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE, JUDITH MCINTIRE APPEARS IN PERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:DG:NOCSR, 4-22-19 - HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT - PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, AND FINAL DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY OF; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less