This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 05:32:32 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY WEST, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY WEST, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, S. WYATT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, S. WYATT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEST, CLAYTON

WEST, DOROTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PAIN GARLAND AND HOBBS LLP

Attorney at PAIN GARLAND AND HOBBS LLP

Po Box 158

Anadarko, OK 73005

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILLS

06/14/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILLS

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILLS

06/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILLS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1% PDG; Amount: $ -0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LEGAL BILLING ANADARKO DAILY; Amount: $ -44.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1% PDG; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Amount: $ 44.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY--DOROTHY WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILLS,APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE OF; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less