This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 10/23/2022 at 10:09:16 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: CHARLES RAY DEWEESE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES RAY DEWEESE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-17

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Carter, Tia

Deweese, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Duncan, Amber

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

04/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

PROBATE INITIAL FILING.

04/01/2021: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

04/01/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PRBATE,APPOINTING PERSONAL REPERSENATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,DEVISEES AND LEGATEES.

04/27/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PRBATE,APPOINTING PERSONAL REPERSENATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,DEVISEES AND LEGATEES.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

12/27/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DTERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

12/27/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DTERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

11/30/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

12/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER FOR HEARING

12/01/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/01/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

GENERAL INVENOTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

09/24/2021: GENERAL INVENOTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: Deweese, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DTERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GENERAL INVENOTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less